FL H0007 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-105, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands the scope of direct primary care agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct Health Care Agreements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 90 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18 Chapter No. 2019-105, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
2019-06-18 Approved by Governor
2019-06-13 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-02HouseOrdered enrolled
2019-05-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-01SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1520
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-05-01SenateWithdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules
2019-04-04SenateReceived
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules
2019-04-03SenateIn Messages
2019-03-27HouseCS passed; YEAS 90 NAYS 24
2019-03-27HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-03-27HouseAmendment(s) failed (512779, 515381)
2019-03-27HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-21HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/27/19
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-14HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
2019-03-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/14/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-11HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-11HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-07HouseCS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/07/19, 9:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1520 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105), CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138)
S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 843 (Ch. 2019-138), CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)
H843 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-138, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7 (Ch. 2019-105)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62427Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback