FL H0015 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises Legislative Auditing Committee duties; specifies purpose of local government fiscal transparency requirements; requires local governments to post voting record information on websites; requires property appraisers & local governments to post property tax information & history on websites; requires public notices for public hearings & meetings before increases of local government tax levies; specifies noticing & advertising requirements; requires local governments to conduct debt affordability analyses under specified conditions; provides method for local governments to post certain required information.
Title
Local Government Fiscal Transparency
Sponsors
House Ways and Means Committee | House Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | Sen. Colleen Burton [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#95 (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations |
2019-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 3 |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19 |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-20 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | CS/CS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time |
2019-03-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-18 | House | CS/CS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 2 |
2019-03-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/18/19, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-13 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-13 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-12 | House | CS by Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, 12 HOB |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1350 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 795 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 801 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 84 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
218 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |