FL H0017 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for calculation of damages for certain health care services, procedures, or equipment under specified circumstances.
Title
Damages
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | House Commerce Committee | House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Tom Leek [R] |
Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died on Calendar |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-10 | House | CS/CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-10 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-09 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 |
2019-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-04-01 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2019-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-28 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 7 |
2019-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 03/21/19, 12:00 pm, Webster Hall -- Temporarily postponed |
2019-03-11 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-11 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-06 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 5 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1320 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
768 | 1258 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 755 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
768 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |