FL H0019 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Chapter No. 2019-99
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to establish the Canadian Prescription Drug Importation Program; authorizing a Canadian supplier to export drugs into this state under the program under certain circumstances; establishing an international export pharmacy permit for participation in the International Prescription Drug Importation Program; authorizing the department to inspect international export pharmacy permittees; providing that the importation of a prescription drug under the International Prescription Drug Importation Program is not a prohibited act under that chapter; requiring the agency, in collaboration with the Department of Business and Professional Regulation and the Department of Health, to negotiate a federal arrangement to operate a pilot program for importing prescription drugs into this state, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Importation Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#288 (Y: 93 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#76 (Y: 93 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11 Chapter No. 2019-99
2019-06-11 Approved by Governor
2019-06-10 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-29HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-04-29HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 93 NAYS 20
2019-04-29HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (339068) 1002
2019-04-29HouseIn returning messages
2019-04-29SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 27 NAYS 13
2019-04-29SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-26SenateAmendment(s) adopted (339068)
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 1528
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-22SenateReceived
2019-04-18SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-04-18SenateIn Messages
2019-04-11HouseCS passed; YEAS 93 NAYS 22
2019-04-11HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-10HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseCS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-03-28HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-28HouseCS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 6
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-18HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 8
2019-03-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 03/18/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall
2019-03-13HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2019-03-12HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 2
2019-03-08HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 8:30 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-20HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1452 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)
S1528 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)
H7073 (Related) 2019-06-27 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 19 (Ch. 2019-99)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38102035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4990051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4990285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/165395/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/000075/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/776563/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/567427/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/564655/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/971401/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/034319/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/337451/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/195555/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/283251/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/098515/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/368506/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/738486/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/539774/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/502814/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Amendment/339068/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Vote/HouseVote_h00019c1076.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Vote/SenateVote_h00019c1005.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/19/Vote/HouseVote_h00019c1288.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback