FL H0031 | 2015 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes provisions relating to certificates of need required for new, expanded, or modified hospital construction; revises AHCA's rulemaking authority with respect to hospitals that provide certain services.
Title
Certificates of Need for Hospitals
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Health Innovation Subcommittee | Sen. Jason Brodeur [R] | Rep. Robert Cortes [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#425 (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Received |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations |
2015-06-12 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-06-12 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 72 NAYS 28 |
2015-06-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-06-11 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-06-11 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (622883) |
2015-06-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-06-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 06/11/15 |
2015-06-10 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2015-06-10 | House | CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-06-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-06-10 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-06-10 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 5 |
2015-06-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 06/10/15, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2015-06-09 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-06-09 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-06-09 | House | CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 |
2015-06-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 06/09/15, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-06-01 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-06-01 | House | Introduced |
2015-05-27 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
395 | 1055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 039 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |