FL H0031 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a private school may join the Florida High School Athletic Association (FHSAA) as a full-time member or on a per-sport basis; authorizing a public school to apply for consideration to join another athletic association; prohibiting the FHSAA from taking any retributory or discriminatory action against specified schools; providing a process for resolving student eligibility disputes, etc.
Title
High School Athletics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#759 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2016-03-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-07 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (568049, 955221) |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16 |
2016-01-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-19 | House | CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2016-01-15 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-14 | House | CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/14/16, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2015-12-01 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2015-12-01 | House | Favorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-11-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/01/15, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-08-27 | House | Referred to Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2015-08-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0684 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S1026 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7039 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S1166 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)
S1026 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7039 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
S1166 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62), CS/CS/HB 7029 (Ch. 2016-237)
H7029 (Similar To) 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-237, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2016-137), HB 5003 (Ch. 2016-62)