FL H0035 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on August 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-23 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-23 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes AHCA to pay for donor human milk bank services as optional Medicaid service under certain conditions; specifies eligibility criteria; adds such services to list of Medicaid services authorized for reimbursement on fee-for-service basis & list of services covered by managed care plans.
Title
Donor Human Milk Bank Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2019-12-23 | House | Withdrawn from Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-08-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S42 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
409 | 906 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 908 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/35 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/35/BillText/Filed/PDF |