FL H0037 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that direct primary care agreement does not constitute insurance & provides requirements for such agreement.
Title
Direct Primary Care Agreements
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Burgess [R] | Rep. Mike Miller [R] | Sen. Bryan Avila [R] | Rep. MaryLynn Magar [R] |
Rep. Bobby Payne [R] | Rep. Ross Spano [R] | Rep. Cyndi Stevenson [R] | Rep. Frank White [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#25 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#523 (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#518 (Y: 37 N: 71 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#523 (Y: 97 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#518 (Y: 37 N: 71 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Chapter No. 2018-89 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-08 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 80 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Appropriations |
2018-01-31 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed; YEAS 97 NAYS 10 419 |
2018-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-01-24 | House | Amendment(s) failed (102461, 304663) |
2018-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/24/18 |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-11-14 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 11/14/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-08-30 | House | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-08-23 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S80 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 37