FL H0043 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 88 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 88 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to prohibition against payment of extra compensation; provides for bonuses; specifies conditions for paying bonuses; requires that contracts providing for severance pay under certain circumstances include specified provisions; defines term "severance pay"; prohibits certain contract provisions that provide for extra compensation to limit ability to discuss contract; deletes provisions relating to power of county or municipality to pay extra compensation, etc.
Title
Public Employee Compensation
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Corcoran [R] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R] | House Government Operations Subcommittee | Rep. Jimmie Smith [R] |
House State Affairs Committee |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 88 (Ch. | |
2011-04-25 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 775 | |
2011-04-22 | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-04-21 | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 3 -HJ 766 | |
2011-04-19 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/21/11, 11:00 am, Morris Hall | |
2011-04-12 | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/14/11, 9:00 am, Morris Hall --Temporarily deferred | |
2011-04-04 | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee | |
2011-04-01 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2011-03-29 | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 3 -HJ 408 | |
2011-03-25 | PCS on Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/29/11, 12:00 pm, 306 HOB | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -HJ 10 | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee -HJ 10 | |
2010-12-06 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0088 () 2011-05-06 - Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (257371) -SJ 1113, 1114
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
215 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 0795 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |