FL H0043 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of term "contribution"; revises schedule governing campaign finance reporting for candidates, political committees, & electioneering communications organizations; revises reporting requirements regarding transfers made by political committees & electioneering communications organizations; prohibits political committee or an electioneering communications organization from transferring funds to certain entities; provides transitional provision regarding final monthly reports by candidates, political committees, & electioneering communications organizations.
Title
Campaign Financing
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] | Rep. Chuck Clemons [R] | Rep. Jason Fischer [R] | Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] |
Rep. Chris Latvala [R] | Rep. Robert Olszewski [R] | Rep. Clovis Watson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-08-30 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee |
2017-08-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S122 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
106 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 0703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 38 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/43 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/43/BillText/Filed/PDF |