FL H0051 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Rejects & condemns white nationalism & white supremacy as hateful expressions of intolerance that are contradictory to values that define people of Florida & United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

White Nationalism and White Supremacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-23HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-08-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S214 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Adopted
S222 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Introduced

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback