FL H0051 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1028, 1st Eng.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1028, 1st Eng.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to school board term limits, charter schools, lab schools, high-performing charter schools, persistently low-performing schools, schools of hope, virtual schools, personnel qualifications, & capital outlay funding.
Title
Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - House - House Education & Employment Committee (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 1028, 1st Eng. |
2021-04-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-22 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021) |
2021-04-16 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2021-04-15 | House | CS Filed |
2021-04-15 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-15 | House | Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee |
2021-04-13 | House | PCS added to Education & Employment Committee agenda |
2021-03-22 | House | Now in Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Education & Employment Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-19 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported out of Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with CS by Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-10 | House | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-08 | House | Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda |
2021-03-03 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Reported out of Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable by Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-03-01 | House | Added to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee agenda |
2021-01-15 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education and Lifelong Learning Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Early Learning and Elementary Education Subcommittee; Education and Employment Committee |
2020-12-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1028 (Same As) 2021-06-02 - Chapter No. 2021-35, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 845 (Ch. 2021-217), CS/HB 1159 (Ch. 2021-228), CS/CS/SB 52 (Ch. 2021-160), CS/CS/SB 366 (Ch. 2021-162)
H1031 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
S1468 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
H1061 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
S1622 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
S1654 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
H1031 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education & Employment Committee; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
S1468 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
H1061 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
S1622 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
S1654 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1028 (Ch. 2021-35)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 333 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 493 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 3415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1013 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |