FL H0053 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public food service establishments to serve sugar-free substitutes for certain syrups, jelly, jam, marmalade, & fruit preserves & provide notice to guests of availability of such sugar-free substitutes; provides requirements for such notice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Food Service Establishments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died in Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2012-01-10 Introduced -HJ 11
2011-09-15 Referred to Business and Consumer Affairs Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 11
2011-07-15 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback