FL H0055 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to s. 4, Art. VII of State Constitution to authorize counties & municipalities to limit assessed value of homesteads of low-income senior citizens.
Title
Homestead Assessment Limitation/Senior Citizens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#870 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Community Affairs | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to Community Affairs; Judiciary; Budget Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Budget -SJ 867 | |
2012-03-05 | Received -SJ 867 | |
2012-02-24 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 776 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 3rd time -HJ 774 | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on 3rd reading | |
2012-02-22 | Read 2nd time -HJ 726 | |
2012-02-20 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/12 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on Calendar -HJ 572 | |
2012-02-08 | Favorable by- Economic Affairs Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 572 | |
2012-02-06 | On Committee agenda-- Economic Affairs Committee, 02/08/12, 8:00 am, Reed Hall | |
2012-01-31 | Now in Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 319 | |
2012-01-31 | Favorable by Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 -HJ 319 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee, 01/31/12, 9:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2012-01-19 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee read 1st time -HJ 231 | |
2012-01-19 | Now in Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee -HJ 235 | |
2012-01-18 | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) | |
2012-01-17 | CS by Finance and Tax Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 -HJ 237 | |
2012-01-12 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 01/17/12, 10:45 am, Morris Hall | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 11 | |
2011-12-05 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax Committee, 12/06/11, 11:00 am, Morris Hall --Workshopped | |
2011-09-15 | Referred to Finance and Tax Committee; Community and Military Affairs Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 11 | |
2011-07-18 | Filed |