FL H0055 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Governor, Lieutenant Governor, or member of Cabinet from soliciting or accepting contributions during regular, extended, or special legislative session; provides penalties.
Title
Campaign Finance
Sponsors
House Public Integrity and Ethics Committee | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. Sam Killebrew [R] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in State Affairs Committee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-01 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | CS by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee read 1st time |
2019-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-28 | House | CS by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 03/28/19, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-13 | House | Now in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2018-11-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S396 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections