FL H0067 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain eye examination for newborns; requires that coverage for children under health insurance policies & health maintenance contracts include certain eye examinations for newborns & infants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eye Care for Newborns and Infants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-23HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-08-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S46 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback