FL H0075 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Chapter No. 2018-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on March 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Chapter No. 2018-8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes FCS institutions to waive portion of certain postsecondary fees for active duty members of U.S. Armed Forces using military tuition assistance; requires FCS institutions to report to SBE number & value of such fee waivers granted annually.
Title
Postsecondary Fee Waivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#541 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#541 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Chapter No. 2018-8 | |
2018-03-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-02-28 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Substituted for SB 460 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Received |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Higher Education; Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-25 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/31/18 |
2018-01-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-18 | House | Favorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 01/18/18, 9:00 am, Reed Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-11-15 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2017-11-15 | House | Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 11/15/17, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2017-10-25 | House | Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-10-25 | House | Favorable by Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2017-10-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee, 10/25/17, 1:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2017-08-30 | House | Referred to Post-Secondary Education Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2017-08-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S460 (Similar To) 2018-02-27 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 75