FL H0075 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises payment amounts under salary incentive program for law enforcement officers; provides for annual inflation adjustment amounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Salary Incentives for Law Enforcement Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-23HouseReferred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee
2019-08-20HouseFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94322Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback