FL H0079 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public schools to create School Staff Assistance for Emergencies (SAFE) Team & school elopement plan; provides requirements for team & plan; requires & provides requirements for elopement quick reference guides for certain students; requires public schools to annually submit their plans to district school board.
Title
Student Elopement
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. Dan Daley [D] | Rep. Michael Gottlieb [D] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] |
Rep. Cindy Polo [D] | Rep. Holly Raschein [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-08-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S650 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/79 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/79/BillText/Filed/PDF |