FL H0081 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-14 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires specified licensed pharmacists to report certain information to DOH; authorizes pharmacists to test for & treat influenza & streptococcus & provides requirements relating thereto; requires that written protocol between pharmacist & supervising physician contain certain information, terms, & conditions; requires Board of Pharmacy to adopt rules; requires pharmacist to notify patient's primary care provider within specified period after providing testing or treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Testing for and Treatment of Influenza and Streptococcus

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-14HouseWithdrawn prior to introduction
2018-12-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H111 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S300 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H815 (Similar To) 2019-02-15 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651895Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback