FL H0089 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employers to register with & use E-Verify system to verify employment eligibility of new employees; suspends employer licenses until registration with E-Verify system; provides for license reinstatement; prohibits employer from knowingly employing unauthorized alien; authorizes complaint to be filed with DEO; provides specified immunity; requires DEO to maintain public database containing certain information & make such information available on its website; authorizes injunctive relief; provides private cause of action & remedies; requires public employers, contractors, & subcontractors to register with & use E-Verify system for specified purposes; prohibits such entities from entering into contract unless each party to contract registers with & uses E-Verify system; authorizes termination of contract; authorizes challenge to such termination.
Title
Verification of Employment Eligibility
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Rep. James Bush [D] | Rep. Brad Drake [R] | Rep. Heather Fitzenhagen [R] |
Rep. Brett Hage [R] | Rep. Walter Hill [R] | Rep. Anthony Sabatini [R] | Rep. Tyler Sirois [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2018-12-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S164 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/89 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/89/BillText/Filed/PDF |