FL H0091 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires charter school and certain private school instructional personnel to teach specified topics relating to Holocaust education; revises requirements for specified instructional content; provides DOE & school district responsibilities relating to Holocaust instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Holocaust Education in Public Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-09-23HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2019-08-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S184 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S1660 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002421Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100342Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034201Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback