FL H0093 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises composition of judicial nominating commissions; establishes additional restrictions regarding commission members; terminating terms of commission members as of specified date; provides for initial appointments & staggered terms for reconstituted commissions; prohibits commission member from serving more than two full terms; provides an exception; requires appointing authorities to consider certain attributes in making appointments to ensure diversity on commissions; requires appointing authorities to collect & release certain demographic data regarding commission members & applicants for commission membership; specifies circumstances under which commission member may not vote on matter & must disclose conflict; requires commission member to complete an educational course after his or her appointment; prescribing minimum requirements for course.
Title
Judicial Nominating Commissions
Sponsors
Rep. Al Jacquet [D] | Rep. James Bush [D] | Rep. Amy Mercado [D] | Rep. Cindy Polo [D] |
Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee; Judiciary Committee |
2018-12-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S138 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/93 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/93/BillText/Filed/PDF |