FL H0095 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-68
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises portions of C-51 reservoir project for which South Florida Water Management District may negotiate; revises water storage & use requirements for project; specifies funding sources for Phase II of project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

C-51 Reservoir Project

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#326 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Chapter No. 2019-68
2019-06-07 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-01HouseOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-01HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0
2019-05-01HouseConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (862984)
2019-04-30HouseIn returning messages
2019-04-30SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
2019-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29SenateAmendment(s) adopted (862984)
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 92
2019-04-29SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-29SenateWithdrawn from Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-03-26SenateReceived
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-03-21SenateIn Messages
2019-03-20HouseCS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0
2019-03-20HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-14HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/20/19
2019-03-07HouseCS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-06HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-05HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-05HouseCS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-01HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/05/19, 4:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-02-13HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-02-13HouseFavorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-06HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-01-28HouseNow in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-01-24HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-01-23HouseCS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2019-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 01/23/19, 1:30 pm, 12 HOB
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2018-12-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S92 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 95

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3734598Amended CodeSee Bill Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/95
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/95/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/95/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/95/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/95/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/95/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/95/Amendment/587337/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/95/Amendment/862984/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/95/Vote/HouseVote_h00095c2006.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/95/Vote/SenateVote_h00095c2003.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/95/Vote/HouseVote_h00095c2326.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback