FL H0099 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires entities that administer or conduct high-risk youth athletic activities or training related to such activities on certain property to require athletics personnel to complete course within specified timeframe; provides for course requirements; provides exemption.
Title
Youth Athletic Activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-08-28 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1406 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/99 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/99/BillText/Filed/PDF |