FL H0109 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires individual & group health insurance policies to cap insured's monthly cost-sharing obligation for covered prescription insulin drugs at specified amount; requires health maintenance contracts to cap subscriber's monthly cost-sharing obligation for covered prescription insulin drugs at specified amount.
Title
Prescription Insulin Drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-09-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H107 (Same As) 2019-09-03 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
S116 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
S116 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 64085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 65746 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/109 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/109/BillText/Filed/PDF |