FL H0115 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 124
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies venue in proceedings for appointment of guardian for child or young adult who is under jurisdiction of dependency court; authorizes court to receive & consider information provided by Guardian ad Litem Program & child's attorney ad litem if child is under jurisdiction of dependency court; requires DJJ to notify specified entities & persons of intent to transfer dependent child from commitment facility or program; adds Guardian ad Litem Program as authorized entity to assist with transition-to-adulthood services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dependent Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseLaid on Table, refer to CS/SB 124
2019-04-10HouseSubstituted CS/SB 124
2019-04-04HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-28HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-03-26HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-21HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-11HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-11HouseNow in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-08HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-06HouseCS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 03/06/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-01-03HouseReferred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2018-12-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S124 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Chapter No. 2019-10

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
322051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3820255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7441097Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98543Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985441Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985461Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback