FL H0123 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes requirement that license to carry concealed firearm is required in order to carry such firearm; limits areas in which concealed carrying of firearm is prohibited; revises criminal penalties; revises provisions relating to carrying of concealed weapons by nonresidents; provides for issuance of concealed carry licenses for reciprocity purposes; specifies that person not otherwise prohibited by law from possessing firearm may own, possess, & lawfully use firearms & other weapons, ammunition, & supplies for lawful purposes.
Title
Carrying of Firearms Without Licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Died in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-12-28 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/123 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/123/BillText/Filed/PDF |