FL H0129 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-24 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires schools to provide certain information relating to free or reduced-price meals; provides school duties & responsibilities relating free or reduced-price meals & students; prohibits schools from taking specified actions.
Title
School Meals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-24 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction |
2017-10-24 | House | Withdrawn from PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2017-09-14 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2017-09-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1610 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/129 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/129/BillText/Filed/PDF |