FL H0131 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-100
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires sheriffs to coordinate with specified entities to develop comprehensive plan for security of trial court facilities; specifies sheriffs & chief judges retain certain authority; specifies sheriffs & their deputies, employees, & contractors are officers of court under specified circumstances.
Title
Security in Trial Court Facilities
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Rep. Stan McClain [R] | Rep. Juan Fernandez-Barquin [R] | Rep. Tommy Gregory [R] |
Rep. Toby Overdorf [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#454 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#454 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chapter No. 2020-100 | |
2020-06-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-10 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Substituted for SB 118 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2020-02-26 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-20 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20 |
2020-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-07 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-06 | House | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 4:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-16 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-09-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S118 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 131