FL H0133 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain hospitals, emergency medical services stations, & fire stations to use newborn infant safety devices to accept surrendered newborn infants under certain circumstances; requires such entities to physically check & test devices at specified intervals; provides additional locations to which prohibition on initiation of criminal investigations based solely on surrendering of newborn infant applies; requires DOH to review & approve newborn infant safety devices.
Title
Surrendered Newborn Infants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#427 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 108 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 108 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in returning Messages |
2021-04-29 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | In returning messages |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment 401131 engrossed amendment (replaces 275019, 036811) |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment 275019 replaced by engrossed amendment |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment 036811 replaced by engrossed amendment |
2021-04-29 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment 816820 as amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment 275019 adopted as amended |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment 036811 adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment 036811 filed |
2021-04-29 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2021-04-29 | House | Amendment 275019 filed |
2021-04-28 | House | Temporarily postponed, on Senate message list |
2021-04-28 | House | Added to Senate Message List |
2021-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2021-04-26 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (816820) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 122 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Received |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2021-03-25 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2021-03-18 | House | CS passed; YEAS 108, NAYS 11 |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-11 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/18/2021) |
2021-03-11 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-11 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-10 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-10 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-10 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-10 | House | Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Favorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-03-05 | House | Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Health & Human Services Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee |
2021-02-09 | House | Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-12-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S122 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 0423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |