FL H0139 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes joint local & state dental care access account initiative, subject to availability of funding; requires DOH to implement EBT system; authorizes DOH to transfer state funds remaining in closed account at specified time & return unspent funds from local sources; requires DEO to rank shortage & medically underserved areas; requires DOH to develop loan program in cooperation with certain dental colleges & Florida Dental Association; provides rulemaking authority; provides appropriation & authorizes position.
Title
Dental Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#651 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#651 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2016-03-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 234 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2016-03-02 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-02 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/16 |
2016-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-17 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/17/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-02-12 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-11 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-10 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 24 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/09/16, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2016-01-14 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-01-14 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2016-01-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/11/16, 4:00 pm, 306 HOB |
2015-09-24 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2015-09-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0234 (Similar To) 2016-03-09 - Laid on Table
S0212 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224)
S0212 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 423 (Ch. 2016-224)