FL H0141 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits tax collector from including on forms, assessing, or collecting certain charges on property tax bills for certain identified populations; prohibits tax collector to authorize debt collection entity to collect certain charges on property tax bills for certain identified populations; prohibits tax collector from selling tax certificate on certain properties if only outstanding amounts due are for delinquent payment of property tax; requires DOR to work with tax collectors to identify mechanisms, strategies, & funding sources for helping certain populations pay for delinquent charges.
Title
Senior Citizen and Teacher Property Tax Protection
Sponsors
Rep. James Bush [D] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Rep. Dotie Joseph [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-09-23 | House | Referred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-09-10 | House | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/141 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/141/BillText/Filed/PDF |