FL H0143 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires securities dealers, investment advisers, & associated persons to report abuse, neglect, or exploitation of vulnerable adults to DCF's central abuse hotline; authorizes dealers & advisers to delay transaction or disbursement of funds or securities based on reasonable belief of exploitation of specified adults; provides notice requirements; authorizes DCF to provide status of investigations to certain persons; requires dealers or advisers to make certain records available to OFR; provides specified immunity for certain persons.
Title
Protection of Vulnerable Investors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#127 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-08 | House | CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-05 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-04 | House | CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | On Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 04/04/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2019-03-26 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-15 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-15 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-13 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-11 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/13/19, 12:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 01/23/19, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall -- Removed from meeting agenda |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Commerce Committee |
2019-01-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1466 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 1034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
517 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |