FL H0157 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-190
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes insurer to electronically transmit insurance policy to insured or other person entitled to receive policy; provides exception to electronic transmission for specified policies; provides requirements for electronic transmission of policy; requires that paper copy of policy be provided upon request of insured or other person entitled to receive policy.
Title
Delivery of Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#227 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#227 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Chapter No. 2013-190 | |
2013-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-10 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 262 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2013-04-24 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-24 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | Favorable by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/16/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-04-02 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-04-01 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-28 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/28/13, 8:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-01-14 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0262 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190)
H0635 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S1046 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
H0635 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in returning Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)
S1046 (Similar To) 2013-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 157 (Ch. 2013-190), CS/HB 1191 (Ch. 2013-209), CS/CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2013-160), SB 356 (Ch. 2013-125), CS/CS/SB 468 (Ch. 2013-66), CS/SB 1842 (Ch. 2013-101)