FL H0157 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes court to sentence certain offenders to county jail for up to 24 months if county has contract with DOC; prohibits offender from receiving gain-time or other credit that would result in offender serving less than 85% of sentence; provides contractual requirements; requires specific appropriations; provides for such appropriations; requires validation of per diem rates.
Title
Sentencing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-02-20 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-02-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-15 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2017-02-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/15/17, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1068 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations