FL H0161 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises definition of "interrogation" to include questioning pursuant to informal inquiry; requires witnesses to be interviewed & certain information to be provided before firefighter is interrogated; authorizes firefighter to provide voluntary statement at any time after being informed of certain right; prohibits firefighter from being threatened; requires copy of interrogation to be provided to firefighter within specified time; provides firefighter may not be retaliated against for exercising his or her rights; requires firefighter be notified & provided certain information before certain actions are taken; provides firefighter with opportunity to address certain findings; requires certain information to be kept confidential until specified time.
Title
Firefighters' Bill of Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S494 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 825 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/161 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/161/BillText/Filed/PDF |