FL H0171 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9-1)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 382
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 382
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides honorary designation of various transportation facilities in specified counties; directs DOT to erect suitable markers.
Title
Transportation Facility Designations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 382 |
2018-03-05 | House | Substituted CS/SB 382 |
2018-03-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-02 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (911557, 967469) |
2018-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/18 |
2018-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-14 | House | CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-14 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-13 | House | CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-09 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 02/13/18, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-10-25 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-10-25 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-10-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 10/25/17, 10:30 am, Reed Hall |
2017-10-11 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-10-11 | House | Favorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-10-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 10/11/17, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2017-09-26 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-09-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S358 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H109 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H127 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H205 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H849 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H1163 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
S330 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S382 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-161
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S1066 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H109 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H127 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H205 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H849 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H1163 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
S330 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S382 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-161
S948 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
S1066 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages