FL H0175 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 374 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 374 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes housing discrimination as cause of action for relief & damages stemming from violations of Florida Civil Rights Act of 1992; revises timeframe & conditions under which aggrieved person may commence civil action to enforce specified rights; authorizes, rather than requires, civil action after alleged discriminatory housing practice; authorizes civil action regardless of certain circumstances; prohibits aggrieved person from filing specified action in certain circumstances; provides exception.
Title
Housing Discrimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 374 passed |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/26/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-28 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Favorable by Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-11-15 | House | Now in Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-11-14 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 11/14/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-09-16 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S374 (Same As) 2020-09-08 - Chapter No. 2020-164
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
760 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/175 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/175/BillText/Filed/PDF |