FL H0187 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides reporting requirements for postsecondary institutions; revises provisions relating to dual enrollment programs; renames collegiate high school programs as early college acceleration programs; revises requirements for such programs; revises deadlines & requirements for articulation agreements; provides additional funding calculations for students in such programs.
Title
Postsecondary Education for Secondary Students
Sponsors
House Education Committee | House Appropriations Committee | House PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee | Rep. Ardian Zika [R] |
Rep. Susan Valdes [D] | Rep. Wyman Duggan [R] | Rep. Amber Mariano [R] | Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-24 | House | CS/CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-02-03 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2020-01-31 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee read 1st time |
2020-01-31 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-29 | House | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 28 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/29/20, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | CS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-12-16 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-16 | House | CS referred to Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2019-12-16 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-12-12 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-12-11 | House | CS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 2 |
2019-12-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 4:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2019-09-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1246 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S62 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H641 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Chapter No. 2020-94
H7067 (Similar To) 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S62 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H641 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Chapter No. 2020-94
H7067 (Similar To) 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1007 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 271 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 273 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |