FL H0201 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 142 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies how trier of fact is to apportion damages in products liability actions alleging additional or enhanced injury resulting from crash of motor vehicle alleged to be defective; provides that doctrine of joint & several liability applies to tort action brought by first responder; defines term "first responder"; provides applicability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Negligence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-03 Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 142 (Ch.
2011-04-12 Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -HJ 618
2011-04-08 On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 04/12/11, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB
2011-03-08 Introduced -HJ 23
2011-02-17 Now in Judiciary Committee -HJ 149
2011-02-16 Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2011-02-09 CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 -HJ 150
2011-02-02 On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 02/09/11, 1:00 pm, 404 HOB
2011-01-25 Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee -HJ 23
2011-01-13 Filed

Same As/Similar To

S0142 () 2011-05-04 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 851

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76881Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback