FL H0201 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires school districts, state universities, & Florida College System institutions to retrofit doors & windows of educational facilities to comply with certain Florida Building Code standards; provides additional requirements; provides for funding through capital outlay funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renovation of Educational Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-03HouseDied in K-12 Subcommittee
2013-03-05HouseIntroduced
2013-01-23HouseReferred to K-12 Subcommittee; Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee
2013-01-16HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1088 (Same As) 2013-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101171Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback