FL H0201 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Designates act as "All-American Flag Act"; requires U.S. flag or state flag that is purchased on or after specified date by the state, county, or municipality for public use to be made in U.S.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flags

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02HouseDied in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2014-03-13HouseNow in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
2014-03-13HouseCS referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee
2014-03-13HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2014-03-12HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time
2014-03-12HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c)
2014-03-12HouseCS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2014-03-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/12/14, 9:00 am, Webster Hall
2014-03-04HouseIntroduced
2013-11-22HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee
2013-10-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1334 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
256041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25609Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback