FL H0201 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment to State Constitution to reassign responsibility for establishing state senatorial, state representative, & congressional district boundaries from Legislature to independent commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative and Congressional Redistricting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseDied in Government Operations Subcommittee
2016-01-12HouseIntroduced
2015-10-07HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee
2015-09-18HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0993 (Related) 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
S1254 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Reapportionment
S1252 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Reapportionment

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback