FL H0201 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes local governmental bodies to designate specified number of safe-haven facilities in each county based upon population size; authorizes approval of local government buildings to serve as safe-haven facilities; limits liability of local governmental entities that provide safe-haven facility; limits actions against state or local government related to transactions taking place at safe-haven facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Classified Advertisement Websites

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseDied in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-01-23HouseReferred to Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee; Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1702 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
501180Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback