FL H0201 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for collection of uniform annual use fee for specialty license plate unless otherwise specified; provides annual use fees for certain specialty license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Credential Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#235 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Infrastructure and Security
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 110 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseAmendment(s) adopted (550473)
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HouseCS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-18HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-18HouseCS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2019-04-16HousePCS on Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/18/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2019-03-26HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2019-03-26HouseFavorable by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-02-07HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseFavorable by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 02/07/19, 10:30 am, Reed Hall
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee
2019-01-09HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H199 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
H505 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Infrastructure and Security, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)
S482 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S480 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1106 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
S1104 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 620 (Ch. 2019-144)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008056Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback