FL H0211 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 344 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 344 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies certain exemptions from court-related fees & charges apply to certain entities; requires court to waive court costs or filing fees for certain proceedings involving public guardians; authorizes physician assistant or advanced practice registered nurse to perform certain examinations & prepare certain reports.
Title
Courts
Sponsors
House Civil Justice Subcommittee | Rep. Juan Fernandez-Barquin [R] | Rep. John Cortes [D] | Rep. Michael Grieco [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 344 passed |
2020-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-23 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 01/23/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-11-25 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-11-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-11-14 | House | CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 11/14/19, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-09-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S344 (Same As) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-73
H607 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Chapter No. 2020-9
H7053 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H607 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Chapter No. 2020-9
H7053 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 2008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 3675 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |