FL H0213 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-107
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revising provisions relating to the communicable disease prevention and control program under the Department of Health; providing that certain students who obtain vaccinations from a college or university student health center or clinic in the state may refuse to be included in the immunization registry; requiring a specified consent to treatment form to contain a certain notice; revising school-entry health requirements to require students to have a certificate of immunization on file with the department's immunization registry; requiring each district school board and the governing authority of each private school to establish and enforce a policy requiring the age-appropriate screening of students for scoliosis, etc.
Title
Immunization Registry
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | Rep. Ralph Massullo [R] | Rep. Joseph Geller [D] | Rep. Brett Hage [R] |
Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#351 (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#168 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#168 (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Chapter No. 2019-107 | |
2019-06-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 111 NAYS 2 |
2019-05-01 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (600638) |
2019-04-24 | House | In returning messages |
2019-04-24 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (600638) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 354 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Education; Rules |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Education; Rules |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 112 NAYS 2 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-03-28 | House | CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2019-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-28 | House | CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/28/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-19 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-03-06 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/05/19, 1:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S354 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 213 (Ch. 2019-107)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |