FL H0215 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires witnesses be interviewed & information be provided to firefighter before interrogation is conducted; authorizes firefighter to provide voluntary statement at any time after being informed of certain right; prohibits firefighter from being threatened during interrogation; requires copy of interrogation be provided to firefighter within specified timeframe, upon request; requires that firefighter be notified & provided certain information before certain disciplinary actions are taken & given opportunity to address certain findings.
Title
Firefighters' Bill of Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-09-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S620 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 825 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/215 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/215/BillText/Filed/PDF |