FL H0221 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 218 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 218 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires successful completion of internship or residency in specified accredited program to be licensed or certified as osteopathic physician.
Title
Osteopathic Physicians Certification and Licensure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 218 passed |
2020-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 01/30/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-15 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-15 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/15/20, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2019-11-06 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-11-06 | House | Favorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 11/06/19, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2019-10-10 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-09-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S218 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-50
S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/221 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/221/BillText/Filed/PDF |